Trustees CHARLTON HORETHORNE VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 304509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Powe | Chair | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Cole | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Powe | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Nicholson | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE HAMILTON-HASTINGS | Trustee | 06 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK LYNCH | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
KEITH GUDGEON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER FLORENCE BIGGS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.