WHEPSTEAD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 304954
Charity reporting is overdue by 768 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £11.70k £13.17k £13.56k £9.96k £10.78k
Total expenditure £11.32k £11.82k £13.00k £13.50k £10.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A £500