Financial history RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 305069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £97.58k £100.68k £98.33k £44.86k £75.32k
Total expenditure £93.53k £78.88k £99.88k £51.16k £74.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £11.33k £8.44k