Financial history SHAMLEY GREEN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £10.78k £15.70k £13.27k £16.74k £13.07k
Total expenditure £9.57k £18.00k £27.52k £16.72k £7.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £7.81k