HASTINGS AND ROTHER SPORTS TRUST

Charity number: 305242
Charity reporting is up to date (67 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £441.81k £341.77k £336.60k £364.50k £449.59k
Total expenditure £409.05k £414.28k £418.46k £455.84k £462.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £37.72k £9.60k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A