Trustees BARNS GREEN PLAYING FIELDS (OR BARNS GREEN VILLAGE HALL)
Charity number: 305386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES MARTIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Chris Fisher | Trustee | 16 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Harding | Trustee | 07 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Gale | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joan Cameron | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
FIONA CHRISTER | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR COURQUIN | Trustee | 30 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
IAN LEA | Trustee | 30 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL PARKES | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARTIN HARGRAVE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN TINGLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLAIRE PARKES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.