Trustees ALDERBURY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 305458
Charity reporting is up to date (103 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Marshall | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
SARA GONZALEZ | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
samantha mouland | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Charlton | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
frances west | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
michael huntley | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Copley | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Tapper | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Gray | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paula Dean | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Clarke | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.