Trustees BOX VILLAGE HALL (KNOWN AS THE SELWYN HALL)
Charity number: 305468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Clare Southgate | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin James Punter | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julian Feasby | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frank Richard Bond | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Godfrey Jones | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Blythe Mahala Lonsdale | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Ingledew | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Eaton | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Raymond James Tarling | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Margaret Anne Barstow | Trustee | 11 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Crow | Trustee | 11 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louise Anderson | Trustee | 11 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ann Francis Narraway | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Geoffrey Holstead | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.