Trustees 11TH IPSWICH SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 305658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Leonard Flack | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Garrod | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Marie Macfadyen | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Suchowij | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Mason | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adam Suchowij | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Pickering | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Mason | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Welsh | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Goffin | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mary Baldry | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHANE O'HALLORAN | Trustee | 24 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Patrick Jameson | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert Sparks | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Chris Baldry | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dave Baldry | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HOLLINGSWORTH | Trustee | 18 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
CARL REEDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David Degiorgio | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OLIVER ARTHUR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.