Trustees WILTSHIRE NORTH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 305942
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR J PURKIS Chair 08 July 2015
WILTSHIRE SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Guy Livingston Trustee 01 December 2019
None on record
Thomas Roberts Trustee 11 January 2018
THE CRUDWELL VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time
Frances Shires Trustee 11 January 2018
None on record
Hannah Millard Trustee 07 November 2017
None on record
MR J A COOMBS Trustee 30 January 2014
None on record
MRS C WEBSTER Trustee 18 September 2012
None on record