THE KEW GUILD

Charity number: 306064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £37.75k £37.75k £46.70k £39.65k £4.78k
Total expenditure £23.47k £23.47k £41.83k £39.65k £4.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A