Governing document HAMILTON LODGE TRUST LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 21 DECEMBER 1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS ON 12 SEPTEMBER 1952, 6 JULY 1983, 10 JUNE 1994, 16 JULY 1996 AND 29TH MARCH 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A HOME TO PROVIDE CARE IN AN ATMOSPHERE OF LOVE, HOPE AND COMPASSION FOR PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HANDICAP, PHYSICAL DISABILITIES, SENSORY DISABILITIES OR MENTAL OR PHYSICAL FRAILTY. ADDITIONALLY,TO PROVIDE CARE FOR THESE PEOPLE INTO THEIR OLD AGE AND FOR OTHER PEOPLE WHO NEED SUCH CARE DUE TO THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL FRAILITY.(FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.