Trustees THE ROYAL FORESTRY SOCIETY
Charity number: 306093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Ayre | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|||||||
Gregory Joseph Vickers | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Felix Gregory | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Blanche Field | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Harriet Charlotte Christina Schiavone | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Ian William Tubby | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Cheryl Lundberg | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Benjamin Cadoc Herbert | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Katherine Jessie Hall | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
SIR JAMES JERVOISE SCOTT BT | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|||||||
Rodney Morgan-Giles | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.