Governing document COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12TH DECEMBER 1967 AS VARIED BY SCHEME 4 MARCH 1974, ORDER 7 AUGUST 1974, SCHEME 2 AUGUST 1978, ORDER 1 NOVEMBER 1988, SCHEME OF 10TH APRIL 1990, SCHEME 2 OCTOBER 1996 AND SCHEME OF 7 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY OR SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY AND IN PARTICULAR BY: I. LOCAL ACTION PROJECTS; II. DEVELOPMENT OF BEST PRACTICE; III. RESEARCH EVALUATION AND POLICY ANALYSIS; IV. MAKING GRANTS AND LOANS TO SUCH COMMUNITIES; V. CONSULTANCIES AND TRAINING PROGRAMMES; VI. CONFERENCES AND SEMINARS; VII. INFORMATION AND PUBLICATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.