Governing document TRURO CATHEDRAL SCHOOL LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 21 NOVEMBER 1960,AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21 MARCH 1985 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 24 MARCH 1982, 19 JUNE 1984 AND AMENDED ON THE 26TH JUNE 1995.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE INDEPENDENT EDUCATION FOR BOYS, GIRLS AND STUDENTS ATTENDING THE SCHOOLS IN THE DIOCESE OF TRURO IN WHICH INSTRUCTION IS GIVEN I.A.W. THE DOCTRINES OF THE C OF E AND/OR CHURCHES IN COMMUNION THEREWITH.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF TRURO
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.