Trustees WILD PLANET TRUST
Charity number: 306622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN KINGS | Chair | 29 July 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Ben Louis Jobson | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Prof. Richard Preziosi | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Charles Cooper | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Professor Adam George Hart FRES | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Mark Salmon | Trustee | 14 April 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Richard Alexander Rowe | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Beth Kathleen McLaughlin | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|||||||||
SARAH BARR | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|||||||||
RICHARD WILLIAM JOHN FORD FINSTD | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|||||||||
RACHAEL HILL BA ACA | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
ANDREW CHARLES JOHN COOPER BSC | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.