Governing document PENNTHORPE SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 APR 1964 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 NOV 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 JUL 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 MAR 2015 as amended on 07 May 2019 as amended on 27 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
To acquire and carry on in the United Kingdom any boarding or day school or schools for the education of children and to provide education based on inclusive values.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.