Trustees THE MABERLY (HAWKLEY) TRUST FUND
Charity number: 307240
Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Venerable Peter Allerton Sutton | Chair | 09 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Vivienne Buckle | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Lentaigne | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY ANNE CRITTENDEN | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mary Keer | Trustee | 07 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Green | Trustee | 07 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Neil Chrimes | Trustee | 31 July 2012 |
|
|||||
JANE WYMAN | Trustee | 18 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH JOHNSON | Trustee | 12 May 2008 |
|
|||||
Carolyn Fair | Trustee | 16 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN CRITTENDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH HAWKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.