Financial history THE BENNETT MEMORIAL DIOCESAN SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity number: 1061647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £80.89k £87.96k £66.69k £79.32k £71.78k
Total expenditure £46.38k £88.30k £53.64k £100.01k £47.32k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A