Trustees HERITAGE HOUSE CARING GROUP ( WELLS-NEXT-THE-SEA ) LIMITED
Charity number: 1062170
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Ann Bidwell | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Pattrick | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Peter Garnett | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Adrianne Granville | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Noy | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Llewelyn | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bee Wood | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Milner | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HORTON-FAWKES | Trustee | 25 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sally Whitworth | Trustee | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Barbara MacBrayne | Trustee | 24 June 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.