AVENUES EAST

Charity number: 1061241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.16m £4.91m £5.02m £5.13m £6.44m
Total expenditure £5.72m £4.87m £5.00m £5.10m £5.59m
Income from government contracts £4.36m £4.32m £4.50m £5.03m £5.01m
Income from government grants £222.51k £145.00k N/A £98.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £13.28k £155.00k £89.00k £0 £829.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.15m £4.75m £4.93m £5.13m £5.61m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.70m £4.87m £5.00m £5.10m £5.59m
Expenditure - Raising funds £15.68k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £23.97k £26.00k £13.00k £4.00k £9.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0