Financial history AGE UK HOUNSLOW

Charity number: 1061681
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £399.48k £504.43k £374.55k £369.38k £344.38k
Total expenditure £542.89k £577.65k £492.39k £352.00k £238.72k
Income from government contracts £80.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £82.55k £92.40k £83.79k £151.13k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £128.35k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £376.08k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £519.06k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £58.59k N/A N/A N/A