Financial history AFRICAN RELIEF FUND

Charity number: 1062752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £650.57k £456.45k £710.23k £346.48k £263.59k
Total expenditure £652.09k £543.67k £567.58k £375.73k £325.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £56.37k £30.02k
Income - Donations and legacies £621.67k N/A £708.73k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £942 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £28.77k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £124 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £566 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £517.41k N/A £477.98k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £54.92k N/A £89.60k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £79.76k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £79.76k N/A £0 N/A N/A