HARROW CARERS

Charity number: 1062149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £651.76k £783.30k £738.19k £891.78k £986.35k
Total expenditure £672.83k £743.73k £794.92k £901.63k £979.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £149.97k £124.80k £166.95k £124.78k
Income from government grants £278.94k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.73k £15.71k £19.95k £29.05k £76.89k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £4.64k £297.18k £0
Income - Charitable activities £628.82k £758.96k £711.60k £564.47k £908.39k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.21k £8.63k £1.99k £1.08k £1.06k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £664.41k £743.73k £794.92k £896.16k £979.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £5.47k £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £10.52k £15.97k £6.24k £25.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £8.42k £0 £0 £0 £0