Financial history ORBIS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1061352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £8.10m £7.48m £8.42m £6.41m £5.95m
Total expenditure £7.54m £8.28m £8.90m £5.66m £6.59m
Income from government contracts £1.61m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £295.10k £499.00k £531.42k £438.45k £319.17k
Income - Donations and legacies £6.49m £7.46m £8.40m £6.39m £5.95m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.61m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.82k £13.51k £21.50k £18.95k £316
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.29m £1.50m £1.60m £1.59m £914.21k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.23m £7.09m £7.44m £4.34m £4.85m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.31m £1.19m £1.46m £1.32m £1.74m
Expenditure - Governance £18.60k £16.63k £210.19k £16.94k £14.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £4.77m £5.72m £0 £0 £3.41m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0