ST CHRISTOPHER'S THE HALL SCHOOL, LIMITED

Charity number: 307917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.45m £2.52m £2.63m £2.65m £2.44m
Total expenditure £2.01m £2.22m £2.30m £2.39m £2.31m
Income from government contracts £122.34k £125.79k £130.78k £138.59k £142.08k
Income from government grants £0 £1.00k £1.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £13.26k £4.80k £17.43k £4.25k £19.60k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.43m £2.52m £2.61m £2.65m £2.42m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.14k £213 £940 £2.51k £2.09k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.01m £2.22m £2.30m £2.39m £2.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.20k £4.40k £4.60k £12.19k £27.71k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0