Governing document THE SIR STANLEY SPENCER MEMORIAL TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26TH MAY 1961 AS AMENDED 8 JULY 2005 AND AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 NOVEMBER 2010 AND ORDER DATED 8 JULY 2005. as amended on 19 Nov 2018 as amended on 18 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE FOUNDATION AND SUPPORT OF AN ART GALLERY TO EXHIBIT PAINTINGS AND OTHER WORKS OF ART BY THE LATE SIR STANLEY SPENCER AND SUCH OTHER PAINTINGS AND WORKS OF ART HAVING AN EDUCATIONAL VALUE;OTHER EDUCATIONAL OBJECTS AS DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
COOKHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.