Governing document SAFFRON WALDEN NURSERY SCHOOL
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED THE 12TH JULY 1972 AS AMENDED 7TH OCTOBER 1982, 4TH OCTOBER 1983, 7TH APRIL 1987, 30TH OCTOBER 1989 AND 16 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23 OCT 2014
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE SCHOOL IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN BY PROVIDING A SUITABLE ENVIRONMENT FOR 2-5 YEAR OLDS WHERE EACH CHILD FINDS OPPORTUNITY THROUGH PLAY AND COMPANIONSHIP OF THEIR OWN AGE, TO DEVELOP ALL OF THEIR POWERS TO THE FULL UNDER THE SUPERVISION AND GUIDANCE OF TRAINED AND QUALIFIED STAFF. THE SCHOOL SHALL BE NON-DENOMINATIONAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.