14TH TONBRIDGE SEA SCOUTS

Charity number: 308284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £53.54k £48.10k £53.12k £63.31k £23.55k
Total expenditure £49.03k £53.03k £49.12k £55.70k £22.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k