Financial history WORFIELD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1077884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.29k £2.34k £2.38k £2.43k £2.48k
Total expenditure £1.50k £250 £0 £2.50k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A