Financial history ST. HELENS GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1076122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £51.67k £52.80k £54.15k £59.99k £57.70k
Total expenditure £61.04k £56.54k £52.87k £53.12k £51.32k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A