THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH ( NORTHERN PROVINCE) TRUST LTD.

Charity number: 1132154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.55m £689.35k £605.11k £1.37m £1.51m
Total expenditure £688.78k £713.36k £668.38k £1.32m £860.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £114.72k £158.57k £192.45k £78.08k £88
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £239.75k £280.60k £354.40k £358.75k £349.44k
Income - Other £1.20m £250.17k £58.26k £935.92k £1.16m
Income - Legacies £55 £3.36k £100.06k £0 £88
Expenditure - Charitable activities £670.39k £618.62k £651.31k £1.25m £796.22k
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.10k £9.84k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.17k £6.27k £6.10k £6.21k £6.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £210.70k £118.01k £133.92k £465.91k £206.85k
Expenditure - Investment management £9.10k £9.84k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £9.29k £84.90k £17.07k £70.81k £64.08k