Financial history THE HUNGERFORD AND CAMBURN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 309062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.18k £3.77k £8.07k £5.03k £7.67k
Total expenditure £4.22k £4.20k £5.55k £8.88k £7.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A