Trustees ST MARY'S SCHOOL (CALNE)

Charity number: 309482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Svante Lennart Stensson Adde Chair 17 November 2018
None on record
The Revd Canon Michael Johnson Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Deborah Harris Trustee 28 November 2020
None on record
Patricia Pearce Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Robert Cutler Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Pamela Mary Sykes Trustee 23 March 2019
None on record
Mrs Cate Bell Trustee 18 November 2017
None on record
Martin Harris Trustee 18 March 2017
None on record
VICTORIA JANE WILSON Trustee
THE CALNE FOUNDATION TRUST
Received: On time