Financial history PARROTT AND LEE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 309586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £37.32k £37.82k £35.76k £33.21k £38.96k
Total expenditure £33.52k £34.63k £36.35k £44.82k £33.51k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A