Trustees SHIPLAKE COURT LIMITED
Charity number: 309651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR DAVID WHITLOCK TANNER KCB CBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sebastian Sales | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE BLOMFIELD | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rose Grimond | Trustee | 22 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Blewett | Trustee | 16 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARSHA CAREY-ELMS | Trustee | 14 March 2014 |
|
|||||
CHARLES PATRICK EVE | Trustee | 03 January 2013 |
|
|||||
IAN HOWELL | Trustee | 03 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARK MACKENZIE-CHARRINGTON | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW ASHTON | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
James Gordon | Trustee |
|
||||||
SUSAN JEAN RYAN BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD CHARLES LESTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.