FOUNDATION OF THOMAS ROE

Charity number: 309801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.41k £2.49k £2.60k £3.09k £4.04k
Total expenditure £2.83k £2.66k £2.19k £3.93k £2.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A