Financial history THE BEACON EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 309911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £7.76m £8.17m £8.43m £8.18m £8.02m
Total expenditure £6.86m £7.22m £7.47m £7.40m £7.50m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.85k £17.69k £31.23k £10.43k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £8.05m £100.49k £73.82k £56.57k
Income - Charitable activities £7.76m £0 £8.29m £8.10m £7.96m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £101.99k £14.74k £0 £2.12k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.74m £7.10m £7.36m £7.34m £7.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £119.31k £111.20k £112.26k £58.15k £41.79k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0