Trustees THE BEACON EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 309911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dipen Thaker Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Andrew Nott Trustee 18 June 2021
None on record
Bhavin Shah Trustee 07 June 2021
None on record
Vicky Fawkes Trustee 21 April 2021
None on record
Alexandra Wansbrough Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
Molly Rose Entrican Trustee 04 January 2021
None on record
Jane Rampin Trustee 17 June 2020
None on record
Gerald Leslie Bailey Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
David Charles Lawson Miller Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Paul McGlone Trustee 03 June 2019
None on record
Sarah Gillam Trustee 24 March 2018
None on record
Richard Herbert Trustee 09 December 2017
None on record
Fiona Mayhew Trustee 18 April 2017
THE BEACON BURSARY FUND (ICW THE BEACON BOYS PREPARATORY SCHOOL)
Received: On time
Marcus Thompson Trustee 04 April 2017
None on record
Stephanie Horrocks Trustee 05 December 2013
None on record