Financial history THE WILLIAM AND MARY CHARITY

Charity number: 309945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £800 £727 £556 £654 £652
Total expenditure £115 £14 £14 £14 £442
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A