ROYAL ACADEMY OF MUSIC

Charity number: 310007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £26.44m £24.25m £33.63m £25.35m £25.41m
Total expenditure £18.56m £20.40m £22.37m £25.05m £24.96m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.58m £5.11m £5.82m £5.02m £5.20m
Income - Donations and legacies £13.36m £9.70m £19.16m £11.30m £11.99m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £9.25m £9.69m £10.49m £10.77m £10.86m
Income - Endowments £814.22k £272.23k £237.82k £431.00k £754.70k
Income - Investment £1.38m £1.46m £1.44m £1.37m £1.37m
Income - Other £3.27m £3.68m £2.79m £2.34m £1.93m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £18.08m £19.74m £21.35m £23.91m £24.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £480.60k £665.15k £1.03m £1.15m £940.40k
Expenditure - Governance £79.42k £67.34k £73.88k £76.82k £92.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £158.91k £177.98k £179.56k £178.48k £164.53k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0