Financial history MERCHANT TAYLORS' EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 310018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £32.63m £29.87m £29.53m £31.36m £32.62m
Total expenditure £26.58m £28.12m £27.77m £28.64m £30.61m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.02m £324.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.05m £138.28k £147.71k £87.00k £79.00k
Income - Other trading activities £303.40k £311.03k £220.50k £182.00k £392.00k
Income - Charitable activities £27.72m £28.60m £28.47m £29.27m £31.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £561.23k £583.19k £451.84k £412.00k £514.00k
Income - Other £0 £239.48k £243.13k £1.41m £484.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £26.04m £27.56m £27.23m £28.23m £29.94m
Expenditure - Raising funds £539.01k £529.65k £518.18k £406.00k £664.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £9.87k £15.44k £30.00k £12.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £744.26k £476.17k £636.00k £640.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £31.12k £22.71k £2.00k £6.00k