Trustees Citizens Advice Central Nottinghamshire
Charity number: 1077828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Lagoe | Chair | 11 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Machary | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Gadie | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Smith | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Jane Heeley | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Mike Berrington | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Craig Drysdale | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Sidel | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Russell | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.