THE LITTLE LOT LIMITED

Charity number: 1063372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £131.83k £152.53k £157.25k £139.48k £130.76k
Total expenditure £144.47k £140.35k £142.81k £138.15k £126.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £76.37k £109.27k £114.14k £94.17k £104.23k