Financial history OPTIONS FOR SUPPORTED LIVING

Charity number: 1063038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.16m £7.00m £7.19m £7.33m £8.47m
Total expenditure £6.09m £6.62m £6.74m £7.24m £8.28m
Income from government contracts £6.14m £6.65m £7.16m £7.24m £6.82m
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £142.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £16.89k £59.86k £143.50k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.14m £6.98m £7.16m £7.24m £8.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.01k £591 £1.79k £15.67k £1.97k
Income - Other £13.33k £19.21k £13.73k £0 £12.16k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.09m £6.62m £6.61m £7.24m £8.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £1.06m £1.03m £555.79k £32.87k £7.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £129.12k £0 £0