Trustees NEW WRITING NORTH
Charity number: 1062729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID LAWRENCE REDMOND ROCHE | Chair | 16 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Hector Miquel Vidal Dura | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Forster | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Crow | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Robert Wright | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Greenwood Dower | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naana Orleans-Amissah | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Harington | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Lloyd | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Degna Michelle Aston Stone | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE MURPHY | Trustee | 16 September 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.