Accounts and annual returns THOMAS CAMBORNE

Charity number: 310312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 March 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 March 2021 396 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required