Accounts and annual returns FOBS - THE FRIENDS OF BLESSED SACRAMENT CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL
Charity number: 1085871
Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 80 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 80 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 296 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 23 March 2022 | 661 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window