Trustees THE HAVEN WOLVERHAMPTON
Charity number: 1065427
Charity reporting is up to date (70 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NAVDEEP HEAR | Chair | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBYN NORTH | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
SIMRAT PARMAR | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH BRAYSHAW | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
CARLY JONES | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carwen Mary WYNNE HOWELLS | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALISON LAWSON | Trustee | 14 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Pringle | Trustee | 07 December 2019 |
|
|||||
CHANTELLE GRANT | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|||||
ROBERT HOWARD MARRIS | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.