Trustees LONG WHATTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1067789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vivienne Matravers | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sonya Buzzard | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Freestone | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Neil | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penny de kock | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penny Fletcher | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Kenneth Taylor | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mike Hampton | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Silke Walker | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS BYRNE | Trustee | 08 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUE BIRD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Richard EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFERY SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.